Homeschool How To Math

How to Multiply In Your Head

how to multiply in your head

Oh, math. You either love it or hate it. Unfortunately for the haters, math is everywhere. Let us show you a trick that will – I hope – make multiplying easier and teach you how to multiply in your head.

For any two numbers up to 20 x 20, you can do the following:

Let’s start with 15 x 12.

  • In your head, the larger number will be on top.
    • 15 x 12.
  • Take the large number and add the ones digit in the smaller number.
    • 15 + 2 = 17
  • Add a zero to the end of this number.
    • 17 = 170
  • Now, multiply the ones digits of each number.
    • 5 x 2 = 10
  • Add the two numbers.
    • 170 + 10 = 180

Let’s try some more.

19 x 14

  • 19 + 4 = 23
  • 230
  • 9 x 4 = 36
  • 230 + 36 = 266

18 x 13

  • 18 + 3 = 21
  • 210
  • 8 x 3 = 24
  • 210 + 24 = 234

Your turn! Let’s practice. Try 16 x 14. Don’t cheat….

Do the steps. You can do this.

Did you get 200 + 24 = 224?

Yay! Bam…you’re a math genius!

Want to learn more cool stuff? Sign up!

Leave a Comment